This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/29/2022 at 01:50:39 (UTC).

Kling v. Cliffwood LLC

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Kling filed an Other lawsuit against Cliffwood LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Duffy-Lewis, Maureen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6880

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Duffy-Lewis, Maureen

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Mary J. Kling

Respondent and Defendant

Cliffwood LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Anthony N. Kling

Attorney at Kling Law Firm

P.O. Box 49165

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Gregory Bernard Scher

Attorney at Woolls Peer Dollinger & Scher

624 S Grand Ave Fl 22

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Sander Alvarez

Attorney at Woolls Peer Dollinger & Scher Firm

One Wilshire Bldg. 624 South Grand Ave., 22Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (November 29, 2021 by Mary J. Kling (U) ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant request for extension of time to file a Case information statement. Requesting 30 day extension till Jan. 26, 2022. *no previous extensions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 29, 2021: RT to be lodged

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Mary Kling.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 29, 2021 by Mary J. Kling(U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV41594; Trial Court Judge: Duffy-Lewis, Maureen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CLIFFWOOD LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alvarez, Sander

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SCHER GREGORY B. ESQ.