This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/04/2023 at 17:04:20 (UTC).

Technology Credit Union v. Rafat

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 Technology Credit Union filed an Other lawsuit against Rafat. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Huber, Joseph. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9471

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Huber, Joseph

 

Party Details

Respondent and Petitioner

Technology Credit Union

Appellant

Matthew Mehdi Rafat

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Petitioner Attorneys

Venus Burns

Jonathan Michael Cohen

 

Court Documents

H049471

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2022

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2022

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/02/2022

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Appellant's memorandum of costs on appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DispositionDescription: Reversed in Full; Disposition Type: Final The order is reversed, and the trial court is directed to dismiss TCU's petition. Rafat is entitled to his appellate costs. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.278(a).) (AMD, PBM & CEW); Publication Status: Signed Published; Author: Danner, Allison M.; Participants: Wilson II, Charles E. (Concur) Bamattre-Manoukian, Patricia (Concur)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketDescription: Motion determined by opinion.; Notes: Ruling on appellant's request for judicial notice is deferred for consideration with the appeal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Published) The order is reversed, and the trial court is directed to dismiss TCU's petition. Rafat is entitled to his appellate costs. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.278(a).) (AMD, PBM & CEW)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022

DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022

DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Change of address for Joseph & Cohen, P.C.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/17/2022

DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: Oral argument in the above-entitled cause will be heard on Thursday, August 4, 2022, at 9:30 a.m., by remote video appearance through the BlueJeans Video Conferencing platform.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/16/2022

DocketDescription: Argument waived by: (no response - 10 day notice); Notes: Respondent; request for oral argument was due 5/13/22.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
11/08/2021

DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Leslie: Thankfully, no. Both Appellant's and Respondent's transcripts were sent in one record. Both parties also received the exhibits for said case. I should note that Appellant requested for two RT's. However, we are still waiting for one more court reporter. You are welcome and don't mind at all.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021

DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Leslie: Are respondents documents being prepared as well? Just want to see if I am able to start briefing or if I waiting on addition transcripts. Sorry for the questions and thank you again!

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021

DocketDescription: Request filed to:; Notes: Request for immediate OSC regarding lower court's and court reporter's failure to provide court with record and objection to Tech Cu's untimely designation of record.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2021

DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 10/22/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2021

DocketDescription: Rec'd co. notice to appellant re: estimate.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/20/2021

DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/18/2021

DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Three fee waivers granted by Superior Court in April of 2021 rejected. An unfiled fee waiver needs to be submitted to this court.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant, order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2021

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: NOA filed 9/20/21

[+] Read More [-] Read Less