This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/24/2022 at 03:38:12 (UTC).

Baky v. Awadalla et al.

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 Baky filed an Other lawsuit against Awadalla. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Baskin, Barry. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3468

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Baskin, Barry

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Antonios Baky

Defendants and Appellants

Samah Sabry Awadalla

Ehab Halim Saad

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Dominic V. Signorotti

Attorney at Dominic V. Signorotti; McKenna Brink Signorotti LLP

1350 Treat Blvd., Suite 105

Walnut Creek, CA 94597

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Brian John Perkins

Attorney at Levin Simes Abrams LLP

1700 Montgomery Street Suite 250

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Samah Sabry Awadalla Attorney: Brian John Perkins Minute Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Samah Sabry AwadallaAttorney: Brian John Perkins; Notes: Minute Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid, Check# 5071395

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 08/13/2021 by Counsel for Defendants Samah Awadalla and Ehab Saad appealing judgment from 08/06/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; County: Contra Costa; Trial Court Case Number: MSC2100859; Trial Court Judge: Baskin, Barry

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PERKINS BRIAN JOHN