This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/20/2023 at 03:01:23 (UTC).

Tinder v. McDonnell

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Tinder filed an Other lawsuit against McDonnell. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hall, Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0692

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hall, Edward

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Guy Tinder

Defendant and Appellant

Robert J McDonnell

Others

Marlene Vincenti Maynard

Mario Sustayta

Not Yet Classified

Grace Day Vincenti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified, Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Bradley R. Kirk

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Timothy Michael Kowal

Other Attorneys

Montgomery Cole

Jeff Berke

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal in this court, the appeal is DISMISSED. The remittitur shall issue forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1 (pages 1-33).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR Kathy Hoffman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 09/20/21 (8.124 w/RT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Mailed to APLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLT: Robert J. McDonnell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2016-00887558; Trial Court Judge: Hall, Edward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less