This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/20/2022 at 02:43:41 (UTC).

Tinder v. McDonnell

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 Tinder filed an Other lawsuit against McDonnell. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hall, Edward. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0692

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hall, Edward

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Guy Tinder

Defendant and Appellant

Robert J McDonnell

Others

Marlene Vincenti Maynard

Mario Sustayta

Not Yet Classified

Grace Day Vincenti

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified, Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Bradley R. Kirk

Attorney at Bradley R. Kirk & Associates, Inc. APLC

2600 Michelson Dr Ste 1700

Irvine, CA 92612

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Timothy Michael Kowal

Attorney at Thomas Vogele & Associates

129 W Wilson St, Ste 200

Costa Mesa, CA 92627

Other Attorneys

Montgomery Cole

Attorney at Madden, Jones, Cole & Johnson

3010 Old Ranch Parkway Ste 450

Seal Beach, CA 90740

Jeff Berke

Attorney at Jeff Berke, A professional Law Coporation

12100 Wilshire Blvd Ste 670

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed pursuant to:; Notes: Appellant having filed a request for dismissal in this court, the appeal is DISMISSED. The remittitur shall issue forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: by appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice of settlement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT-1 (pages 1-33).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR Kathy Hoffman

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 09/20/21 (8.124 w/RT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Filing fee paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Mailed to APLT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: APLT: Robert J. McDonnell

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2016-00887558; Trial Court Judge: Hall, Edward

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less