This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/30/2021 at 17:37:39 (UTC).

Perry v. NP PARC CHATEAUX, LLC. et al.

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 Perry filed an Other lawsuit against NP PARC CHATEAUX, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Taylor, Tricia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3293

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Taylor, Tricia

 

Party Details

Respondents and Plaintiffs

Moshe Michael A. Perry

West Hills, CA 91307

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Appellants and Defendants

NP PARC CHATEAUX, LLC.

A SUBSIDIARY OF ALLIANCE RESIDENTIAL & COMMERCIAL, INC.

(ALLRESCO)

Alex Villanueva

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Tania Kim Cardoso

Attorney at Hollenbeck & Cardoso, LLP

7755 Center Ave, Ste 1100

Huntington Beach, CA 92647

Respondent Attorneys

The Honorable Patti Jo McKay

Attorney at Appellate Division Los Angeles Superior Court

111 N. Hill Street, 6Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Hon. Tricia Taylor

Attorney at The Chatsworth Superior

9425 Penfield Ave Dept. F44

Chatsworth, CA 91311

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Transfer/certification denied; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered defendant's "Petition to Transfer Combined for Judicial Economy with a Certiorari for Extraordinary relief and a Stay . . . to Annul the May 19, 2021 Opinion of the Appellate Division . . . With a Writ of Mandate and Prohibition . . ." filed on June 28, 2021. We have also read and considered defendant's application to "combine a petition for transfer . . . with/based on a Petition for Certiorari . . . and for Writ of Mandate . . ." filed on the same date. The application to combine the two petitions is granted. As we indicated in our prior orders, we have concluded this case does not satisfy the requirements for transfer under Rule 8.1002. (See Case Nos. B312708, 312746 & 313036.) Further, there is no basis for certiorari or mandate. Accordingly, the combined petition is denied. Grimes-Wiley-Ohta

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Petitioner's application to file an oversized brief, filed June 28, 2021, is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: Request to waive court fees. (No order included).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: Petition to transfer combined for judicial economy with a certiorari with a STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Application to file oversized brief (exceeding word count).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NP Parc Chateaux, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant