This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/26/2022 at 00:43:21 (UTC).

Ari Investment Cases

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Ari Investment Cases was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Wilson, Peter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0076

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Wilson, Peter

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Gary Lamm

Helen Schweiger

Lorelei Mooney

Herbert Schweiger

James Mieuli

ARI-DFW East & West 9, LP

Defendants, Respondents, Appellants and Plaintiffs

Argus Realty, LLC

ARI-Securities Centre One & Two, LLC

ARI-Meridian Plaza, LLC

ARI Financial Services, Inc.

Argus Realty Investors, LP

ARI-DFW, East & West, LP

ARI-Copley Business Center, LLC

Maxwell B. Drever

ARI-Powers Ferry Office Park, LLC

ARI-Barrett Office Center, LLC

ARI-Shoreview Corporate Center, LLC

ARI-Atrium Office Building, LLC

ARI-DFW East & West 9, LP

Timothy E. Snodgrass

Richard Gee

20 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant, Plaintiff, Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Kenneth J. Catanzarite

Attorney at Catanzarite Law Corporation

2331 W Lincoln Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

Eric V Anderton

Attorney at Catanzarite Law Corp

2331 W Lincoln Ave

Anaheim, CA 92801

Philip Charles Tencer

Attorney at TencerSherman, LLP

12520 High Bluff Dr Ste 230

San Diego, CA 92130

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Atty Kenneth Catanzarite will argue for apppellants - 30 minutes.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument letter sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: ARI-DFW East & West 9, LP Attorney: Kenneth J. Catanzarite Three extensions granted for a total of 35 days: 03/09/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/24/2022 By 14 Day(s) 03/23/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/07/2022 By 14 Day(s) 04/07/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/14/2022 By 7 Day(s) LAST EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: ARI-DFW East & West 9, LPAttorney: Kenneth J. Catanzarite; Notes: Three extensions granted for a total of 35 days: 03/09/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 03/24/2022 By 14 Day(s) 03/23/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/07/2022 By 14 Day(s) 04/07/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/14/2022 By 7 Day(s) LAST EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: LAST EXTENSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Misc. fee received for:; Notes: Paid by respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: ARI-DFW, East & West, LP Attorney: Philip Charles Tencer One extension granted for a total of 15 days: 02/02/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 02/18/2022 By 15 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: AOB +42, RB + 50, ARB + 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's stipulation was rejected. Lower court case number needs to be corrected.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: RT, pages 1-45.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: D. Mullarky, M. Cooper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 4/8/21 - proceeding by Rule 8.124 with RT's

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Aplts: Lorelei Mooney et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP 4811; Trial Court Judge: Wilson, Peter

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ARI-Atrium Office Building, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ARI-Barrett Office Center, LLC is a litigant