This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 12/02/2021 at 12:16:11 (UTC).

Parry v. Christensen et al.

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Parry filed an Other lawsuit against Christensen. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bowick, Stephanie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2863

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bowick, Stephanie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

David Parry

Respondents and Defendants

Andrew Marc Christensen

Ralph Grocery Company

The Kroger Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Byron Michael Purcell

Attorney at Ivie, Mcneill & Wyatt

444 S. Flower Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Justin Hays Sanders

Attorney at Sanders Roberts, LLP.

1055 West 7Th St. Ste 3050

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Charles H. Goldstein

Attorney at The Goldstein Law Firm, PC

8912 Burton Way

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Due on 11/29/2021 By 83 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Requested for 11/29/2021 By 83 Day(s) Leandra Amber (court reporter) request for extension of time to prepare transcript on appeal. requesting extension till Nov. 11, 2021. (No previous extensions)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: David Parry Attorney: Byron Michael Purcell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: David ParryAttorney: Byron Michael Purcell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (May 7, 2021: David Parry ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Byron Purcell.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated May 28, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: May 7, 2021: David Parry

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC682854; Trial Court Judge: Bowick, Stephanie

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RALPHS GROCERY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SANDERS JUSTIN HAYS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLDSTEIN CHARLES