This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/26/2022 at 00:08:42 (UTC).

Parisi v. Magnum Property Investments LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 01/06/2021 Parisi filed an Other lawsuit against Magnum Property Investments LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cotton, Jr., Huey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0086

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cotton, Jr., Huey

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Paula Parisi

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Respondents and Defendants

Magnum Property Investments LLC

U.S. Bank National Association

Wells Fargo Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Harris L. Cohen

Attorney at Harris L. Cohen, APC

5305 Andasol Avenue

Encino, CA 91316

Elliot Gunner Johnson

801 K St Ste 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814-3521

Ian Anthony Rambarran

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K St Ste 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Robert M. Shaughnessy

Attorney at Klinedinst PC

801 K Street Suite 2100

Sacramento, CA 95814

Katalina Baumann

601 West Fifth St. - #300 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Alejandro P. Pacheco

601 W 5Th St Ste 300

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3506

Justin D. Balser

Attorney at Troutman Pepper LLP

5 Park Plz, Ste 1400

Irvine, CA 92614

Adam Frederick Summerfield

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP

350 S Grand Ave, Ste 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Paula Parisi - Brief was due May 2, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: U.S. Bank National Association.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: re 2/22/22 stipulation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief. Due on 05/02/2022 By 61 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: The proceeding of 9/4/20 in Dept A will not be part of the oral record on appeal becasuse there is no record of a hearing held that date. If the date was listed in error, a motion may be filed with the reviewing court to Augment record on appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: The minute order(s) indicate that a court reporter was not present at the time of hearing or trial (Feb. 2, 2021). Therefore civil appeals will not notify any court reporter(s) to prepare transcripts.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-4 (1157 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Justin D Balser of Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP substituted in as counsel of record for respondent Wells Fargo Bank in place and instead of Alejandro Pacheco & Katalina Baumann of Akerman LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated June 1, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed Apr 13, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of appearance by Robert M. Shaughnessy as counsel of record for respondent US Bank National Association.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Paula Parisi Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 paid via CC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appeal dismissed for failure to file opening brief.; Due Date: 05/26/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Paula ParisiPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Paula ParisiPro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 1/6/2021 by Paula Parisi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19VECV01628; Trial Court Judge: Cotton, Jr., Huey

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MAGNUM PROPERTY INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PACHECO ALEJANDRO P