This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/25/2022 at 03:11:18 (UTC).

PARISH v. THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/27/2022 PARISH filed an Other lawsuit against THE OHIO CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4854

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Don E. Parish

Defendant and Respondent

The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David Alan Cooper

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert B. Mobasseri, PC.

1055 West 7Th Street, Suite 2140

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Robert B Mobasseri

Attorney at Law Offices of Robert B. Mobasseri, PC.

1055 West 7Th Street, Suite 2140

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Stacie Louise Brandt

Attorney at Booth, Mitchel & Strange, LLP

701 S. Parker Street, Suite 6500

Orange, CA 92868

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Don E. Parish Attorney: David Alan Cooper *Pursuant to rule 8.1120(b)(1), the Court of Appeal transmitted the request for publication to the Supreme Court with the recommendation that the opinion not be published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Two; Court of Appeal Case Number: E075135; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Bernardino County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: CIVDS1717151

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ohio Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRANDT STACIE