This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/12/2023 at 05:04:29 (UTC).

PAREDES v. CREDIT CONSULTING SERVICES

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 PAREDES filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CREDIT CONSULTING SERVICES. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6713

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Cross Defendant

Credit Consulting Services, Inc.

Respondent and Not Yet Classified

Maritza Paredes

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Mark E. Ellis

Attorney at Ellis Law Group LLP

1425 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815

Lawrence K. Iglesias

Attorney at Ellis Law Group LLP

1425 River Park Drive, Suite 400

Sacramento, CA 95815-4524

Paul William Moncrief

Attorney at Moncrief & Hart, PC

16 West Gabilan Street

Salinas, CA 93901

Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Frederick William Schwinn

Attorney at Consumer Law Center, Inc.

38 West Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Raeon Rodrigo Roulston

Attorney at Consumer Law Center, Inc.

38 West Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including December 30, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Cross-defendant and Appellant: Credit Consulting Services, Inc. Attorney: Mark E. Ellis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H048092; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 18CV328603

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Credit Consulting Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELLIS, MARK E