This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/23/2021 at 15:07:18 (UTC).

Paramount Exclusive Insurance Services, Inc. v. Cabir

Case Summary

On 09/14/2021 Paramount Exclusive Insurance Services, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Cabir. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lui, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5279

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lui, Christopher

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Paramount Exclusive Insurance Services, Inc.

Defendant and Appellant

Shantelle Cabir

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Farrow

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson, LLP

17901 Von Karman Ave. 10Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Mark B. Robinson

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson, LLP

17901 Von Karman, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

Monica Emad Boutros

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

725 S Figueroa St, Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kevin S Kim

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson, LLP

17901 Von Karman, Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92614

Samantha Alice Gavin

Attorney at Michelman & Robinson LLP

17901 Von Karman Ave 10Fl

Irvine, CA 92614

Chad Daniel Bernard

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC

725 S Figueroa St Ste 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Bonita Dombey Moore

Attorney at Moore Ruddell LLP

21250 Hawthorne Blvd. Suite 500

Torrance, CA 90503

Howard David Ruddell

Attorney at Moore Ruddell LLP

21250 Hawthorne Blvd. Ste 500

Torrance, CA 90503

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #4024581 for $775

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Shantelle Cabir Attorney: Bonita Dombey Moore Attorney: Howard David Ruddell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Shantelle CabirAttorney: Bonita Dombey Moore Attorney: Howard David Ruddell

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on September 14, 2021 by Shantelle Cabir

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV20468; Trial Court Judge: Lui, Christopher

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARAMOUNT EXCLUSIVE INSURANCE SERVICES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE BONITA D.