This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/02/2023 at 10:01:02 (UTC).

Palombo v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2022 Palombo filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kleifield, Steven. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1036

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kleifield, Steven

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bruna Palombo

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Serena R. Murillo

Interested Party

Alexandra Zarini

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Cynthia Elaine Organ

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Julie Rose Gerchik

Respondent Attorney

Court Counsel

Interested Party Attorneys

Deborah Mallgrave

Claire-Lise Y. Kutlay

Alan Asher Greenberg

Michael John Reck

Hagerey Amare Mengistu

 

Court Documents

B321036

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.; Notes: Palombo is to recover her costs in this proceeding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition granted by opinion; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Segal, John; Participants: Feuer, Gail Ruderman (Concur) Howard, Geoffrey M. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate is granted. Let a peremptory writ of mandate issue directing the superior court to vacate its order denying Palombo's motion to quash service of summons and to enter a new order granting the motion. Palombo is to recover her costs in this proceeding. (Signed Unpublished)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: All counsel - Bluejeans oral argument instructions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: This case is ordered on calendar for December 2, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. by remote appearance.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Alan A. Greenberg for RPI Alexandra Zarini. (Remote)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Attorney Elizabeth Chilton for petitioner (remote appearance)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent. Calendar date:; Notes: December 1 or 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice sent to parties re: case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Return by answer to petition for writ of mandate or other appropriate relief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Written return filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: TO THE SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES: Good cause appearing, you are hereby ordered to show cause before this court, in its courtroom at 300 South Spring Street, Los Angeles, California when this matter is ordered on calendar, why you should not be compelled to vacate your order of May 13, 2022 denying petitioner's motion to quash service of summons and issue a new and different order granting the motion. The written return shall be served and filed by the real party in interest on or before August 31, 2022. Petitioner may file a reply to the written return, within 20 days after the filing of the return.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's reply to opposition to petition for writ of mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest's opposition to petition for writ of mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on June 20, 2022 has been read and considered. The real party in interest is requested to serve and file a preliminary opposition, limited to the issue of specific jurisdiction, on or before July 15, 2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Two volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less