This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/13/2021 at 01:22:14 (UTC).

Palacios v. Zenith Specialty Bag Co., Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2021 Palacios filed an Other lawsuit against Zenith Specialty Bag Co , Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Burdge, Jr., Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2804

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Burdge, Jr., Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Rosa Palacios

Appellants

Workforce Outsourcing, Inc.

Priority Workforce, Inc.

Defendants and Respondents

Zenith Specialty Bag Co., Inc.

Rosa Palacios

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Vincent Charles Granberry

Attorney at Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP

8889 W Olympic Blvd Ste 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Appellant Attorneys

Monique Alexandra Eginli

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

1055 W. Seventh Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Rafael G. Nendel-Flores

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC

1055 W 7Th St, Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Robert Allen Hufnagel

Attorney at Resnick & Louis, P.C.,

3350 Shelby St, Ste 200,

Ontario, CA 91764-5556

Vincent Charles Granberry

Attorney at Lavi & Ebrahimian, LLP

8889 W Olympic Blvd Ste 200

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Voluntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to appellants' request, the appeal filed April 30, 2021 is dismissed. The clerk is directed to issue the remittitur forthwith. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.244(c)(2).)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for dismissal filed.; Notes: by appellants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CIS submitted via Truefiling on 6/10/2021 has been rejected. No judgment/order provided.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant: Priority Workforce, Inc. Attorney: Rafael G. Nendel-Flores Appellant: Workforce Outsourcing, Inc. Attorney: Rafael G. Nendel-Flores (amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Appellant: Priority Workforce, Inc.Attorney: Rafael G. Nendel-Flores Appellant: Workforce Outsourcing, Inc.Attorney: Rafael G. Nendel-Flores; Notes: (amended)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Nendel-Flores, Rafael.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated May 10, 2021: 8.122 w. RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: April 30, 2021: Priority Workforce, Inc., et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV40726; Trial Court Judge: Burdge, Jr., Richard

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WORKFORCE OUTSOURCING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIORITYWORKFORCE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ZENITH SPECIALTY BAG CO. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRANBERRY VINCENT CHARLES