This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/08/2022 at 04:15:09 (UTC).

PADILLA v. CITY OF SAN JOSE

Case Summary

On 06/28/2022 PADILLA filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CITY OF SAN JOSE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Case Initiated.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5261

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Case Initiated

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Thomas H. Padilla, Sr.

Darlene Padilla

Respondents and Defendants

City of San Jose

County of Santa Clara

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Gretchen M. Nelson

Attorney at Kreindler & Fraenkel LLP

601 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2050

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Gregg A. Rapoport

Attorney at Gregg A. Rapoport, APLC

444 South Flower Street, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2918

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Nora Valerie Frimann

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

151 W Mission Street

San Jose, CA 95110

Ardell Johnson

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 East Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Margo Laskowska

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

City Of San Jose 200 East Santa Clara Street, 16Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Christopher Randall Creech

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

200 East Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Mark Francis Bernal

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

70 West Hedding Street, East Wing 9Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110

George Allen Brandt

Attorney at Office of the County Counsel

70 West Hedding Street, East Wing 9Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95110-1705

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Thomas H. Padilla, Sr. Attorney: Gregg A. Rapoport Plaintiff and Appellant: Darlene Padilla Attorney: Gregg A. Rapoport

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: City of San Jose Attorney: Margo Laskowska

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of substitution of counsel; Notes: City of San Jose, Defendant and Respondent Margo Laskowska, City Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Thomas H. Padilla, Sr. Attorney: Gregg A. Rapoport Plaintiff and Appellant: Darlene Padilla Attorney: Gregg A. Rapoport

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H046132; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: CV307419

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITY OF SAN JOSE is a litigant

Latest cases where COUNTY OF SANTA CLARA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brandt, George Allen

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Creech, Christopher Randall