This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 09/01/2021 at 15:49:05 (UTC).

PACIFICA FOUNDATION INC. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 PACIFICA FOUNDATION INC filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Stern, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3421

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 7

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Stern, Michael

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PACIFICA FOUNDATION INC.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Michael L. Stern

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Andrea Turner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Adam D. H. Grant

Attorney at ALPERT, BARR & GRANT, APLC

15165 Ventura Blvd., Suite 200

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Alexander Samuel Kasendorf

Attorney at ALPERT, BARR & GRANT, APLC

15165 Ventura Blvd., Suite 200

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Stephen R Jaffe

Attorney at THE JAFFE LAW FIRM

1 Sansome St Ste 3500

San Francisco, CA 94104-4436

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on July 6, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on July 6, 2021. The petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: Real Parties in Interest's preliminary opposition of petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $390 Responsive Filing Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Real parties in interest's preliminary opposition to petition.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's notice of errata re typographical error. The immediate stay should be based upon Rule of Court 8.486(a)(7)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a STAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where Pacifica Foundation Inc. is a litigant