This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 02/25/2021 at 01:34:49 (UTC).

PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL v. ABEKASIS

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against ABEKASIS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3319

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Cross Defendants

Arie Abekasis

Sherman Oaks, CA 91401

Pacifica Development and Construction Fund, LLC

363 N Sweetzer Ave LLC

Not Yet Classified and Respondents

Pacifica First National, Inc.

612 N. Fuller Ave., LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified, Respondent, Appellant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Bruce D. Rudman

Attorney at Abdulaziz Grossbart & Rudman

6454 Coldwater Canyon Avenue P.O. Box 15458

North Hollywood, CA 91606-1187

Robert F. Smith

Attorney at Attorney at Law

16200 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 318

Encino, CA 91436

Kenneth Samuel Grossbart

Attorney at Abdulaziz, Grossbart & Rudman

6454 Coldwater Canyon Avenue

North Hollywood, CA 91606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Cross-complainant and Respondent: Pacifica First National, Inc. Attorney: Bruce D. Rudman Cross-complainant and Respondent: 612 N. Fuller Ave., LLC. Attorney: Bruce D. Rudman Cross-defendant and Appellant: Pacifica Development and Construction Fund, LLC Attorney: Bruce D. Rudman Cross-defendant and Appellant: 363 N Sweetzer Ave LLC Attorney: Bruce D. Rudman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of substitution of counsel; Notes: Attorney Robert F. Smith substitutes out as counsel for petitioner. Petitioner Arie Abekasis is now in pro per.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Petitioner's notice of errata.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Cross-defendant and Appellant: Arie Abekasis Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Cross-defendant and Appellant: Arie Abekasis Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 8; Court of Appeal Case Number: B298292; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC602042

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where 612 N FULLER AVE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFICA DEVELOPMENT & CONSTRUCTION FUND LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where PACIFICA FIRST NATIONAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUDMAN BRUCE D. ESQ.