This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/23/2022 at 12:16:38 (UTC).

Pacifica Firefighters Association v. City of Pacifica

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 Pacifica Firefighters Association filed an Other lawsuit against City of Pacifica. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1575

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Pacifica Firefighters Assocation

Respondent

City of Pacifica

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorney

Richard P. Fisher

Attorney at Goyette & Associates

2366 Gold Meadow Way, Suite 200

Gold River, CA 95670

Respondent Attorneys

Michelle M. Kenyon

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen LLP

1901 Harrison Street, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612-3501

Nicholas J. Muscolino

Attorney at Burke, Williams & Sorensen LLP

1901 Harrison Street, Suite 900

Oakland, CA 94612

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Richard Fisher, attorney for Appellant Pacifica Firefighters Association

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record to court for review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: 21-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Pacifica Firefighters Assocation Attorney: Richard P. Fisher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Pacifica Firefighters AssocationAttorney: Richard P. Fisher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Augmentation granted. (See order.); Notes: Respondent City of Pacifica's unopposed motion to augment the record is granted and the record on appeal is augmented to include those documents itemized within the motion, which is attached and incorporated by reference.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Respondent's Motion to Augment Record on Appeal (augmentation attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Nicholas Muscolino, attorney for respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Appellant (Fees; dated 12/18/20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: Appellant Pacifica Firefighters Assocation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Notice of Entry of Judgment or Order & Judgment filed 10/13/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Pacifica Firefighters Assocation Attorney: Richard P. Fisher Richard P. Fisher, attorney for appellant, with copy of order/judgment attached to docket #120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Pacifica Firefighters AssocationAttorney: Richard P. Fisher; Notes: Richard P. Fisher, attorney for appellant, with copy of order/judgment attached to docket #120

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 12/07/2020 by Counsel for Petitioner Pacifica Firefighters Association appealing judgment from 10/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 19CIV04212

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KENYON, MICHELLE MARCHETTA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas J. Muscolino