This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/27/2022 at 13:26:10 (UTC).

Pacific Continental Engines, Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Pacific Continental Engines, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Doyle, John. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8294

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Doyle, John

 

Party Details

Respondents

Hon. John P. Doyle

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Joshua Reikes

Michael Binder

Massimiliano Sansa

Lizmarie Serrano

Matthews William

Intervenor Starnet Insurance Company

Solano Aircraft Maintenance LLC.

Beechcraft/Textron Aviation, Inc.

Adrian Kerry Lyons

Style Aviation Services, Inc.

David William Baker

Lyons Aircraft LLC

Stelling

Mather Aviation Van Nuys LLC.

Baker Aero Electric

Mather Aviation LLC

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Kevin R. Boyle

Attorney at Panish Shea & Boyle, LLP

11111 Santa Monica Blvd. - #700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

David B. Shapiro

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

633 W 5Th St Ste 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nathan Emanuel Werksman

Attorney at Panish Shea & Boyle

11111 Santa Monica Blvd #700

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul Robert Flaherty

Attorney at Murchison & Cumming

801 S Grand Ave 9Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Randall Christopher Rechs

Attorney at Law Ofc Randall C Rechs

11455 El Camino Real Ste 358

San Diego, CA 92130-3046

Arthur I. Willner

Attorney at Leader & Berkon LLP

660 S. Figueroa St. Ste. 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Olga Guadalupe Pena

Attorney at Leader Berkon Colao & Silverstein LLP

660 S Figueroa St Ste 1150

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3424

Joseph Z. Mkryan

Attorney at Cunningham Swaim, LLP

2 N Lake Ave Ste 550

Pasadena, CA 91101-1833

Jonathan Edward Hembree

Attorney at Cunningham Swaim LLP

2 N Lake Ave Ste 550

Pasadena, CA 91101

Manuel Saldana

Attorney at Gordon & Reese, LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David M. Shaby

Attorney at Law Offices Of David M. Shaby, II

11949 Jefferson Boulevard Suite 104

Culver City, CA 90230

Ryan Christopher Harshman

Attorney at David M. Shaby II & Associates, APC

11949 Jefferson Boulevard, Suite 104

Culver City, CA 90230

Joseph Michael Kar

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph M. Kar

15250 Ventura Blvd. Suite 1220

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Justin T. Green

Attorney at Kreindler & Kreindler

100 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10017

Other Attorneys

Stuart Rolf Fraenkel

Attorney at Nelson & Fraenkel LLP

601 S Figueroa St, Ste 2050

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Shalem A. Massey

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP

100 Spectrum Center Dr Ste 440

Irvine, CA 92618

Willie Spencer Skinner

Attorney at Skinner Law Group

21600 Oxnard St Ste 1760

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Ben-Thomas Hamilton

Attorney at Garrison & McInnis LLP

3110 Camino Del Rio South Suite 203

San Diego, CA 92108

3 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed October 22, 2020, as well as the joinder filed the same date. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $390 Responsive Filing Fee Paid

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: proof of service of petition for writ of mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: R. Christopher Harshman (Lyons parties) regarding joinder to writ petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed joinder of:; Notes: joinder in petition for writ of mandate filed by Lyons Aircraft LLC and Adrian Kerry Lyons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate Memorandum of Points and Authorities

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less