This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 06:14:00 (UTC).

Owens v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Owens filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 7 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fujie, Holly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5514

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fujie, Holly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Decora Owens

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Holly J. Fujie

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Southern California Permanente Medical Group

LaSalle Williams

Other

Minh T. Nguyen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Twila S. White

Attorney at Law Offices of Twila S. White

2615 Pacific Coast Highway, Suite 325

Hermosa Beach, CA 90254

Respondent Attorney

Court Counsel

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Dr

San Marino, CA 91108

Nayri Jilizian

Attorney at COLE PEDROZA LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Zena Jacobsen

Attorney at Cole Pedroza, LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Patice Alana Gore

Attorney at LTL ATTORNEYS LLP

300 S. Grand Ave., Suite 3950

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David Wesley Ammons

Attorney at LTL Attorneys LLP

300 S. Grand Ave., Suite 3950

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3124

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on January 10, 2023. The petition is denied because petitioner has an adequate remedy by way of appeal. (See URS Corp. v. Atkinson/Walsh Joint Venture (2017) 15 Cal.App.5th 872, 878 [orders granting or denying attorney disqualification motions are appealable orders].)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Minh T. Nguyen in support of Petition for Writ of Mandate, prohibition or other appropriate relief and/or request for immediate Stay of November 16, 2022 Order disqualifying Petitioner's Counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: Twila S. White in support of Petition for Writ of Mandate, prohibition or other appropriate relief and/or request for immediate Stay of November 16, 2022 Order disqualifying Petitioner's Counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: One volume of Exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate, prohibition or other appropriate relief and/or request for immediate Stay of November 16, 2022 Order Disqualifying Petitioner'r counsel; Memorandum of points and authorities.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less