This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/21/2022 at 05:12:35 (UTC).

Owens et al. v. Alta Hospital System, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 04/14/2022 Owens filed an Other lawsuit against Alta Hospital System, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1065

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Glorious Owens

Nigeria Owens

Jordan Owens

Estate of Shamoi Owens

Respondents and Defendants

Weiming Chu

Mohammad Rezvani

Alta Hospital System, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Dakar Diourbel

Attorney at Diourbel & Associates

3006 S Vermont Ave # 445

Los Angeles, CA 90007

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jordan Reuel Gaskins

3581 Glenrose Ave,

Altadena, CA 91001-3914

Leon Tao

3435 Wilshire Blvd, Ste 1400,

Los Angeles, CA 90010-1923

Cassidy C. Davenport

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Jordan R. Gaskins

Attorney at Wood, Smith, Henning & Berman, LLP

505 North Brand Blvd, Suite 1100

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's joint motion to incorporate briefing and record in related pending appeal submitted Nov 10, 2022 via truefiling is rejected at filer's request.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Civil case information statement submitted on August 31, 2022 returned for failure to attach the appealed order. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.100(g)(1).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order of dismissal vacated.; Notes: The court has read and considered appellant's motion to reinstate appeal and declaration of counsel in support thereof, filed August 31, 2022. Good cause appearing, the order of dismissal filed August 4, 2022, is vacated and the appeal filed April 14, 2022, is reinstated. Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by appellant's failure comply as required by the rules of court. Appellant must serve and file a Notice of Designating the Record on Appeal and pay the reporter's transcript fees to the Superior Court pursuant to California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and/or 8.130 within 7 days from the date of this order. All acts (except for payment of fees) in compliance with this relief order are to be performed via the Los Angeles County Superior Court's electronic filing service provider. Payment of fees must be made at Room 111A at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, California. Self-represented parties are not required to electronically file and may comply with this order at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111A, Los Angeles, California. Appellant shall take immediate action to cure the default and, under no circumstances, shall appellant take more than 7 days to do so. If appellant fails to cure the default in a timely manner, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately notify the Court of Appeal, and the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Proposed Order to motion to reinstate appeal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.; Notes: Motion to reinstate appeal and declaration of counsel in support thereof

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's request for extension of time to file motion for reinstatement is granted to 08/31/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's application for extension of time to file motion for reinstatement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed; Disposition Type: Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.100(g), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed April 14, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: clerk's notice of noncompliance of default on appeal dated 7/27/22; failure to designate a record on appeal, or pay RT fees/deposits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal returned due to appellant must file the designation of record in Superior Court (CRC, rule 8.1.21(a)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (4/14/2022 by Glorious Owens et al. ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: The law firm of Cole Pedroza LLP associates in as counsel of record for respondent Mohammad Rezvani

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed 4/14/2022 by Glorious Owens et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV11294

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALTA HOSPITALS SYSTEM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GASKINS JORDAN R.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Tao, Leon

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVENPORT CASSIDY COLE