This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/15/2023 at 00:49:02 (UTC).

Overland Direct, Inc. v. Esola Capital Investment, LLC. et al.

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Overland Direct, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Esola Capital Investment, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Sturgeon, Eddie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0447

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Sturgeon, Eddie

 

Party Details

Appellant and Not Yet Classified

A & S Park Boulevard, LLC

Respondents and Not Yet Classified

Overland Direct, Inc.

Esola Capital Investment, LLC.

15720 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 405

Encino, CA 91436

Daniel Tepper

Tarzana, CA 91356

A & S Park Boulevard, LLC

Respondents and Cross Defendants

Esola Capital Investment, LLC.

15720 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 405

Encino, CA 91436

Daniel Tepper

Tarzana, CA 91356

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Appellant Attorneys

Benjamin Eli Strauss

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

2049 Century Park East, Ste. 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3119

Philip Alan Metson

1875 Century Park East, Ste. 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2523

Benjamin Shatz

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips

2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Respondent and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

George D Rikos

Attorney at Law Offices of George Rikos

225 Broadway, Suite 2100

San Diego, CA 92101

John Foster Whittemore

Attorney at Blanchard Krasner & French

800 Silverado St., 2Nd Fl.

La Jolla, CA 92037

Alan Keith Williams

Attorney at Blanchard Krasner & French

800 Silverado St., 2Nd Fl.

La Jolla, CA 92037

Benjamin Eli Strauss

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

2049 Century Park East, Ste. 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3119

Philip Alan Metson

1875 Century Park East, Ste. 800

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2523

Benjamin Shatz

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips

2049 Century Park East, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Notes: Cross-defendant and Respondent: Esola Capital Investment, LLC. Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Notes: Cross-defendant and Respondent: Daniel Tepper Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketBrief: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Party Attorney: Cross-defendant and Respondent: Esola Capital Investment, LLC.Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketBrief: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Party Attorney: Cross-defendant and Respondent: Daniel TepperPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: AS to Tepper and Esola Capital

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Respondent's opposed motion to dismiss filed on November 29, 2022 will be considered concurrently with the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Appellant's oppo. to motion to dismiss

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF. Due on 02/14/2023 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on request for judicial notice deferred; Notes: Appellant's request for judicial notice, filed November 15, 2022, will be considered concurrently with the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR, Wood: 1/28/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: A&S Park

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: 3/25/22 - designation included in NOA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Corporation no counsel letter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 4/8/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 3/25/22 by A&S Park Boulevard, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2011-00071216-CU-OR-EC; Trial Court Judge: Sturgeon, Eddie

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A&S Park Boulevard LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ESOLA CAPITAL INVESTMENT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OVERLAND DIRECT INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Eli Strauss