This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/23/2023 at 03:30:53 (UTC).

Orange County Social Services Agency v. W.B.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2022 Orange County Social Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against W B. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Apkarian, Isabel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1978

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Apkarian, Isabel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Orange County Social Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

W. B.

Not Yet Classified

V. B.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

County Counsel Juvenile

Attorney at Juvenile Writs and Appeals Div.

P.O. Box 119

Santa Ana, CA 92702

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Sarah Marie Vaona

340 S. Lemon Ave #6192

Walnut, CA 91789-3361

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Counsel for appellant has filed a brief stating no arguable issues can be found. (In re Sade C. (1996) 13 Cal.4th 952, 994.) Counsel has further requested that appellant be extended time within which personally to file a brief. No good cause having been shown, the request is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: W. B. Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: W. B.Attorney: Sarah Marie Vaona

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental record/transcript filed.; Notes: 1 CT (pgs. 1 - 2)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record omission letter received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-1 (152 pages) RT-1 (28 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Sarah Vaona has been appointed to W.B. - appellant (Father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: L. Munoz.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: By aplt V. B. (FATHER)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 22DP0532; Trial Court Judge: Apkarian, Isabel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE COUNTY SOCIAL SERVICES AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Marie Vaona