This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/30/2022 at 07:05:48 (UTC).

Orange County Social Services Agency v. L.L.

Case Summary

On 04/06/2022 Orange County Social Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against L L. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerard, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1271

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gerard, Robert

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Orange County Social Services Agency

Defendant and Appellant

L. L.

Not Yet Classified

W. L.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

County Counsel Juvenile

Attorney at Juvenile Writs and Appeals Div.

P.O. Box 119

Santa Ana, CA 92702

Aurelio Torre

Attorney at County Counsel

P. O. Box 119

Santa Ana, CA 92702

Defendant and Appellant Attorney

Lauren K. Johnson

Attorney at Law Office of Lauren K. Johnson

19200 Von Karman Ave Ste 600

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

G061271

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On September 2, 2022, we issued an opinion in this appeal. On September 8, 2022, the parties filed a stipulation for immediate issuance of the remittitur. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.272(c)), this court ORDERS early finality of its decision by opinion and the clerk of this court is directed to issue the remittitur forthwith. MOTOIKE, J. WE CONCUR: O'LEARY, P. J. BEDSWORTH, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation filed to:; Notes: Stipulation to immediate remittitur

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Motoike, Joanne; Participants: O'Leary, Kathleen E. (Concur) Bedsworth, William W. (Concur)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: Conditionally reversed and remanded. (Signed Unpublished) (Motoike) O'Leary Bedsworth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Submission order filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: ARB not filed (time elapsed or notice no brief).; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: L. L. Attorney: Lauren K. Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: Orange County Social Services AgencyAttorney: County Counsel Juvenile

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: L. L. Attorney: Lauren K. Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: L. L.Attorney: Lauren K. Johnson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Lauren K. Johnson is appointed as counsel on appeal for appellant father L.L. This case will be independent.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: 1 envelope: Pages 417-421Scanned and placed in sealed cabinet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2 CT (496 pages) and 1 RT (130 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: L. Richardson, M. Aceves, B. Torres

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant L.L. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 20DP1587; Trial Court Judge: Gerard, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE COUNTY SOCIAL SERVICES AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren K. Johnson