This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/22/2023 at 07:00:58 (UTC).

Orange County Social Services Agency v. L.A.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2022 Orange County Social Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against L A. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keough, Dennis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1885

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keough, Dennis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Orange County Social Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

L. A.

Not Yet Classified

R. M.

I. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

County Counsel Juvenile

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Johanna R Shargel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: All documents scanned.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Counsel for appellant has filed a brief stating no arguable issues can be found. (In re Sade C. (1996) 13 Ca1.4th 952, 994.) Counsel has further requested that appellant be extended time within which personally to file a brief. No good cause having been shown, the request is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Ca1.4th 835.) O' LEARY, P.J. Presiding Justice Copy mailed to appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: L. A. Attorney: Johanna R Shargel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: L. A.Attorney: Johanna R Shargel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Johanna Shargel is appointed for appellant L.A. (mother). Appellant's opening brief extended to 12-16-22. Copy mailed to appellant.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: 5 confidential envelopes: 1 dated 6-21-21, report (pg 361) 1 dated 6-28-21, order (pgs 381-386) 1 dated 10-15-21, order (pgs 461-466) 1 dated 1-25-22, Req., Stmt, (pgs 546-549) 1 dated 4-7-22, report (pgs 657-671)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: CT-3 (881 pages) RT-1 (269 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: G. Solorio, B. Acheson, M. Aceves, J. Gamulao.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: By aplt L. A. (MOTHER) Processed on 10-10-22.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 20DP0373; Trial Court Judge: Keough, Dennis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 20DP0372; Trial Court Judge: Keough, Dennis

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less