This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/16/2022 at 00:55:52 (UTC).

Orange County Social Services Agency v. J.C.

Case Summary

On 10/25/2021 Orange County Social Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against J C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kreber Varipapa, Mary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0806

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kreber Varipapa, Mary

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Orange County Social Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

J. C.

Not Yet Classified

D. C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

County Counsel Juvenile

Attorney at Juvenile Writs and Appeals Div.

P.O. Box 119

Santa Ana, CA 92702

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Marsha F. Levine

3972 Barranca Pkwy Ste J #514

Irvine, CA 92606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • HearingDescription: ***Jurisdictional order due***.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Counsel for appellant has filed a brief stating no arguable issues can be found. (In re Sade C. (1996) 13 Cal.4th 952, 994.) Counsel has further requested that appellant be extended time within which personally to file a brief. No good cause having been shown, the request is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: J. C. Attorney: Marsha F. Levine 12-08-2021: One 14 day extension granted by order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: J. C.Attorney: Marsha F. Levine; Notes: 12-08-2021: One 14 day extension granted by order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order on motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's application filed on December 9, 2021 to transmit confidential documents is GRANTED. The clerk of this court is directed to: (1) unseal pages 247-252 of the clerk's transcript; (2) transmit a copy of these documents to appellant's counsel of record only; and (3) reseal the record. These materials include an addendum to a confidential medical evaluation of appellant conducted pursuant to Evidence Code section 730. Appellant's trial counsel had access to these materials in the trial court. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.45(d).) The requested record is confidential and shall not be copied or transmitted to any other party. Sealed documents mailed to appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion/request for sealed or confidential transcripts filed by:; Notes: filed by appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order on motion filed.; Notes: Appellant's application filed on December 7, 2021 to transmit confidential documents is GRANTED. The clerk of this court is directed to: (1) unseal pages 210-237 of the clerk's transcript; (2) transmit a copy of these documents to appellant's counsel of record only; and (3) reseal the record. These materials include a confidential medical evaluation of appellant conducted pursuant to Evidence Code section 730. Appellant's trial counsel had access to these materials in the trial court. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.45(d).) The requested record is confidential and shall not be copied or transmitted to any other party. Appellant's application for an extension of time to file appellant's opening brief is GRANTED. Appellant's opening brief is due on January 10, 2022.Sealed pages mailed to appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion/request for sealed or confidential transcripts filed by:; Notes: Filed by appelllant. Appellant is also requesting an extension to file the AOB.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: 3 envelopes dtd 3-4-21 pages 210-237, dtd 3-10-21 pages 247-252, dtd 10-7-21 pages 402-406.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2CT (PAGES 1- 421) & 1RT (PAGES 1-160).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Attorney Marsha F. Levine is appointed for appellant J.C. (mother).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Court reporter extension granted.; Notes: Record on appeal filed. Due on 11/25/2021 By 10 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR Barbara Prokop, Pam Stamper-Taylor, Kathleen Cagney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: J. C. (mother)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 19DP1427; Trial Court Judge: Kreber Varipapa, Mary

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D. C. is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COUNTY SOCIAL SERVICES AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marsha F. Levine