This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/08/2023 at 11:08:26 (UTC).

Orange County Social Services Agency v. C.P.

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 Orange County Social Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against C P. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Apkarian, Isabel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1790

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Apkarian, Isabel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Orange County Social Services Agency

Appellant, Defendant and Not Yet Classified

C. P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

County Counsel Juvenile

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Amy Z. Tobin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/21/2023

DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: E-filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2023

DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/04/2023

DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: courtesy copy from appellant's counsel returning 1024-1043 of the confidential record

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Counsel for appellant has filed a brief stating no arguable issues can be found. (In re Sade C. (1996) 13 Cal.4th 952, 994.) Counsel has further requested that appellant be extended time within which personally to file a brief. No good cause having been shown, the request is DENIED and the appeal is DISMISSED. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: C. P. Attorney: Amy Z. Tobin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/20/2022

DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: C. P.Attorney: Amy Z. Tobin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/12/2022

DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: ***LAST EXTENSION***

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/15/2022

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On November 14, 2022, appellant filed an application to transmit specified portions of the confidential record on appeal and an application to extend the time to file appellant's opening brief. The pertinent confidential portions of the clerk's transcript are: (1) page 685-697 (JV-295, De Facto Parent Request, JV-296, De Facto Parent Statement, and JV-297, De Facto Parent Order); (2) pages 1024-1043 (psychological evaluation of appellant as ordered pursuant to Evidence Code, section 730); (3) page 1199 (JV-322, Confidential Information - Prospective Adoptive Parent); (4) pages 1200-1201 (JV-321, Request for Prospective Adoptive Parent Designation); and (5) pages 1320-1329 ( JV- 295, Amended De Facto Parent Request, and JV-296, Amended De Facto Parent Statement). The application to transmit confidential documents is GRANTED in part. The clerk of this court is DIRECTED to: (1) unseal pages 685-697, 1024-1043, 1200- 1201, and 1320-1329 of the clerk's transcript; (2) transmit a copy of these specified pages to appellant's counsel of record only; and (3) reseal the record. It appears that appellant's counsel had access to these documents in the trial court. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.45(d).) The requested record is confidential and shall not be copied or transmitted to any other party. With regard to the psychological evaluation of appellant, appellant's counsel is ORDERED to return the copy of pages 1024-1043 to this court upon completion of the appeal. The application to transmit confidential documents is DENIED with regard to page 1199, the substance of which consists solely of the prospective adoptive parents' confidential information (i.e., home address and home phone number). No showing is made that counsel for appellant had access to this document in the trial court. Appellant's application for an extension of time to file appellant's opening brief is GRANTED. Appellant's opening brief may be filed by December 12, 2022. No further extensions of time to file appellant's opening brief will be granted.Mailed to APLT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
11/14/2022

DocketDescription: Application filed to:; Notes: Appellant's application to transmit confidential documents

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/11/2022

DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Amy Z. Tobin is appointed for the Appellant Father. This case will be INDEPENDENT. AOB is due on 11-14-22.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2022

DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: The record on appeal has been filed this date under the above case number. The number must appear on the cover of all briefs and all subsequent documents filed in this court. Appellant's opening brief is due on October 31, 2022 and must comply with rules 8.74, 8.204, 8.416 and 8.40 of the California Rules of Court. Failure to comply with those rules may result in the striking of the brief. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.204(e).) Parties are encouraged to register for automatic e-mail notifications about this case at the court's website at: htttp://www.courts.ca.gov.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2022

DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: 7 envelopes 1 envelope dated 8-3-20 X4. 9-9-20, 10-13-20, 10-23-20, 10-27-20, 12-4-20, 12-24-20, 4-6-21, 4-16-21, 6-10-21, 7-19-21, 7-20-21, 8-27-21, 8-31-21, 9-9-21, 9-13-21, 11-29-21, 1-20-22 x 3, 3-17-22, 3-24-22, 5-4-22, 5-6-22, 6-13-22, 7-6-22, 7-7-22, 7-8-22. 1 envelope dated 4-22-22. Pages 1320-1326 and pages 1327-1329. 1 envelope dated 2-22-22. Pages 1199-1199 and pages 1200-1201. 1 envelope dated 11-10-21. Pages 1024-1043. 1 envelope dated 6-14-21. Pages 685-685 and pages 686-697. 1 envelope dated 9-23-20. Pages 203-203. 1 envelope dated 8-6-20. Pages 91-91.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/29/2022

DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 5 CT (1544 pages) 2 RT (544 pages)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022

DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: L. Munoz, B. Torres, J. Thomas, P. Stamper, K. Wright, J. Cabello

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/09/2022

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: By Appellant C.P. (Father)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 20DP1314; Trial Court Judge: Apkarian, Isabel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 20DP0948; Trial Court Judge: Apkarian, Isabel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 20DP0949; Trial Court Judge: Apkarian, Isabel

[+] Read More [-] Read Less