This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/30/2022 at 05:11:16 (UTC).

Orange County Social Services Agency v. A.C.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 Orange County Social Services Agency filed an Other lawsuit against A C. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gerard, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1354

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Gerard, Robert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Orange County Social Services Agency

Appellant and Defendant

A. C.

Not Yet Classified

C. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

County Counsel Juvenile

Attorney at Juvenile Writs and Appeals Div.

P.O. Box 119

Santa Ana, CA 92702

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Michelle D. Pena

Attorney at Law Office of Michelle D. Pena

3830 Valley Center Dr Ste 705 Pmb 706

San Diego, CA 92130

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record shipped to records center; Notes: e-Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Other involuntary dismissal; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: On July 6, 2022, counsel for appellant filed a brief stating no arguable issues can be found. (In re Sade C. (1996) 13 Cal.4th 952, 994.) On July 7, 2022, appellant submitted a supplement brief, which was filed by the court. The court has read and considered the two briefs. No good cause has been shown that an arguable issue exists. The appeal is DISMISSED. (In re Phoenix H. (2009) 47 Cal.4th 835.)Copy of order emailed to juv dept.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supplemental brief filed by:; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. C. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • DocketBrief: Supplemental brief filed by:; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. C.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: A. C. Attorney: Michelle D. Pena Two extensions granted for a total of 16 days: 06/20/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/05/2022 By 15 Day(s) 07/05/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/06/2022 By 1 Day ** LAST EXTENSION **

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: Sade C. Brief Filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: A. C.Attorney: Michelle D. Pena; Notes: Two extensions granted for a total of 16 days: 06/20/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/05/2022 By 15 Day(s) 07/05/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 07/06/2022 By 1 Day ** LAST EXTENSION **

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: ** LAST EXTENSION **

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Confidential document filed*********; Notes: 1-CT env; dtd 04/28/2022 - De Facto Parent (page 360)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: 2-CT (1-365 pages) 1-RT (1-45 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Counsel appointment order filed.; Notes: Atty Michelle D. Pena is appointed for the appellant. This case will be INDEPENDENT.Copy of order sent to appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: L. Richardson, C. Rosenberg

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: A.C. (Mother)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Lamoreaux Justice Center; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 21DP0066; Trial Court Judge: Gerard, Robert

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE COUNTY SOCIAL SERVICES AGENCY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle D. Pena