This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/23/2022 at 01:15:33 (UTC).

Champion Motorsports, Inc. v. Alpha & Omega Global, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2022 Champion Motorsports, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Alpha Omega Global, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Marquez, Raquel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9215

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Marquez, Raquel

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants and Appellants

Alpha & Omega Global, Inc.

Duo Li

Not Yet Classified and Respondent

Champion Motorsports, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Douglas Thomas Richardson

5753-G Santa Ana Canyon Road #542

Anaheim, CA 92807

William C. Bollard

Attorney at Julander, Brown & Bollard

9110 Irvine Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Michael Adam Tate

Attorney at Julander, Brown & Bollard

9110 Irvine Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Alan Chiu-Chang Chen

Attorney at Rimon P.C.

2029 Century Park East, Suite 400N

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Terry Anastassiou

Attorney at Ropers Majeski, PC

505 Sansome Street, Suite 1925

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ivan L Tjoe

Attorney at Rimon P.C.

2029 Century Park East, Suite 400N

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Alan Chiu-Chang Chen

Attorney at Rimon P.C.

2029 Century Park East, Suite 400N

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Terry Anastassiou

Attorney at Ropers Majeski, PC

505 Sansome Street, Suite 1925

San Francisco, CA 94111

Ivan L Tjoe

Attorney at Rimon P.C.

2029 Century Park East, Suite 400N

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Respondent, Defendant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

William C. Bollard

Attorney at Julander, Brown & Bollard

9110 Irvine Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Michael Adam Tate

Attorney at Julander, Brown & Bollard

9110 Irvine Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: To court.; Notes: AOB extn request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 10/20/2022 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference declined.; Notes: Declined by court, prebriefing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Ivan Tjoe, trial counsel for Appellant Alpha & Omega Global, Inc., advising OPL Auto Parts, Inc. and Yangzhou Jiahe Radiator Co. Ltd., are not parties to this appeal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Terry Anastassiou, counsel for Appellants, advising of the name of trial counsel for his client Alpha & Omega Global, Inc. Advised he may be of some assistance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Terry Anastassiou, counsel for Appellants, asking if he knows who is new counsel for Respondents OPL Auto Parts, Inc. and Yangzhou Jiahe Radiator Co., Ltd.; and if so, could he please advise of that attorney's contact information.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Adam Tate, counsel for Respondent Champion Motorsports, Inc., advising he does not know who is new counsel for Respondents OPL Auto Parts, Inc. and Jiahe Radiator Co. Ltd. Advised contacting Appellants' counsel as he may know.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Michael Tate, counsel for Champion Motorsports, Inc. asking him in light of the death of Mr. Richardson, counsel for Respondents OPL Auto Parts, Inc. and Jiahe Radiator Co. Ltd., does he know the name of the attorney who may now be representing these Respondents.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Counsel for Respondents OPL Auto Parts, Inc. and Yangzhou Jiahe Radiator Co. Ltd., RE: overdue SCIF. Attached another copy of SCIF for completion and return by end of business today.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.; Notes: E-filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: CCIS - lacking service on respondents, need change of address for associated counsel Ropers Majeski, PC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellants; Ropers Majeski, PC is associated w/ Rimon P.C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellants notice of association of counsel; Service is missing for the respondent OPL Auto parts, inc et al

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: Appellants notice of association of counsel; New associated counsel's signature is missing from the document.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: 70 day letter sent (rule 8.124).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: dtd Jul 12, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: by appellants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jun 17, 2022; Alpha & Omega Global, Inc. and Duo Li

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: MCC1401104; Trial Court Judge: Marquez, Raquel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALPHA AND OMEGA BUILDER OF JACKSONVILLE, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Adam Tate