This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/19/2023 at 02:01:40 (UTC).

Omni Contracting (California) Inc. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2022 Omni Contracting California Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Draper, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4142

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Draper, Robert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Omni Contracting (California) Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Robert S. Draper

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

Domus Design Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

John M. Morris

Attorney at Higgs, Fletcher & Mack L L P

401 West "A" Street Suite 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

Steven M. Brunolli

Attorney at Higgs Fletcher & Mack LLP

401 West A Street, Suite 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Herb Fox

Attorney at Law Office of Herb Fox

1114 State St. Suite 200

Santa Barbara, CA 93101

Tony Blain

Attorney at BLAIN & ASSOCIATES, A.P.C.

8840 Wilshire Blvd

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed October 26, 2022, as well as the preliminary opposition thereto. The petition is denied. Real party in interest's motion to strike, filed November 7, 2022, is also denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $390 responsive filing fee paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: real party in interest Domus Design Group, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: RPI motion to strike portions of petitioner's exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: preliminary opposition to the petition for writ of mandate filed by RPI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Herb Fox, Esq., of the Law Office of Herb Fox, as attorney for Real Party in Interest

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Three volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less