This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/13/2023 at 20:37:55 (UTC).

Olbert v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/06/2023 Olbert filed an Other lawsuit against Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Brazile, Kevin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7402

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Brazile, Kevin

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Sarah Olbert

Appellant and Defendant

Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph V. Bui

Amy-Lyn Morse

Radomir Roger Kirnos

Cynthia E. Tobisman

Steve Borislav Mikhov

Jacob William Cutler

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Soheyl Tahsildoost

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2023

HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2023

DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: ONE: e-filed reporter (dated Jan. 9, 2023)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/02/2023

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated April 14, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Firm of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP associated in as co-counsel of record for respondent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC Attorney: Soheyl Tahsildoost

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 11/13/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLCAttorney: Soheyl Tahsildoost

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLCAttorney: Soheyl Tahsildoost

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #235146 for $775.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/27/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on March 06, 2023 by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/2023

DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV11486; Trial Court Judge: Brazile, Kevin

[+] Read More [-] Read Less