This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/25/2021 at 03:02:14 (UTC).

Ojjeh v. Brown

Case Summary

On 11/23/2020 Ojjeh filed an Other lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Greenberg, Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1488

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Greenberg, Susan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Bassell Ojjeh

Defendants and Respondents

Stephen Brown

Ignite Channel, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Mark R. Figueiredo

Attorney at Structure Law Group, LLP

1754 Technology Drive, Suite 135

San Jose, CA 95110

Parsa Kafi

Attorney at Structure Law Group, LLP

1754 Technology Dr Ste 135

San Jose, CA 95110-1320

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Walter C. Cook

Attorney at Walter C. Cook, Attorney at Law

2995 Woodside Road, Suite 400

Woodside, CA 94062

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: ***NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME CONTEMPLATED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/28/2021 By 18 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: to appellant's 3rd request for extension of time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 06/09/2021 By 30 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: To respondents motion to dismiss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: To appellant's extension of time filed on 4/7/21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 05/10/2021 By 31 Day(s) 31 days to 5/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 05/10/2021 By 31 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: In support of motion to dismiss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to dismiss by respondent.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: County Clerk; re appellant cured default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: 12/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bassell Ojjeh Attorney: Mark R. Figueiredo with order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 05/28/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bassell OjjehAttorney: Mark R. Figueiredo Attorney: Parsa Kafi; Notes: ***NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS OF TIME CONTEMPLATED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Bassell OjjehAttorney: Mark R. Figueiredo; Notes: with order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/3/20 designated 8.124 with RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 11/23/2020 by Counsel for Plaintiff Bassell Ojjeh appealing judgment from 09/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 18CIV01902; Trial Court Judge: Greenberg, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COOK, WALTER C.