This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/19/2022 at 00:39:27 (UTC).

O'Hara et al. v. Hannley et al.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2021 O'Hara filed an Other lawsuit against Hannley. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Convey, Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6809

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Convey, Michael

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified, Plaintiffs and Appellants

Eamon O'Hara

Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump Holley LLP

Greg Hannley

Vincent Hanley

Respondents, Defendants and Not Yet Classified

Greg Hannley

Vincent Hanley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified, Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Patricia Anne Millett

Attorney at Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump LLP

808 Wilshire Boulevard 3Rd Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Dale F. Kinsella

808 Wilshire Blvd., Third Floor

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Steven S. Karic

Attorney at Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Not Yet Classified, Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Steven S. Karic

Attorney at Hamburg, Karic, Edwards & Martin LLP.

1900 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1800

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Fritzie Galliani

1770 East Corson Street

Pasadena, CA 91106-1606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • HearingDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: proof of service of notice of appeal - showing service on Judicial Counsel per CCP 425.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Dear Counsel: The clerk of the superior court has sent this court a copy of the notice of appeal filed November 22, 2021 in the above-entitled matter. The appeal appears to be taken from the ruling on a motion filed pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16. Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16(j)(1) and California Rule of Court 8.29(a), a copy of your notice of appeal must be transmitted to the Judicial Council at 455 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102-3660. It does not appear that the Judicial Council has been served with a copy of the notice of appeal as required. Therefore, please submit to this court a proof of such service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: ONE: Clerk/Settled Statement (174 Pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Candace E. Hoffman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 2, 2021: 8.124 w. Settled Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Eamon O'Hara Attorney: Patricia Anne Millett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 06/06/2022; Party Attorney: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Eamon O'HaraAttorney: Patricia Anne Millett Cross-complainant and Appellant: Kinsella Weitzman Iser Kump Holley LLP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Cross-complainant and Appellant: Eamon O'HaraAttorney: Patricia Anne Millett

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee received

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on November 22, 2021 by Eamon O'Hara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BD641535; Trial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19SMCV00113; Trial Court Judge: Convey, Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GALLANI FRITZIE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KARIC STEVEN S.