This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 07/28/2021 at 15:25:15 (UTC).

Ochoa v. T-Mobile USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/17/2021 Ochoa filed an Other lawsuit against T-Mobile USA, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3009

  • Filing Date:

    06/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Daniel Ochoa

San Francisco, CA 94103

Respondents and Defendants

T-Mobile USA, Inc.

Assurant Inc.

Convergent Outsourcing, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Robert Harry Horn

9948 Robbins Drive No. 4

Beverly Hills, CA 90212-1628

Theodore O'Reilly

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park E Ste 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-1504

Brett B Goodman

Attorney at Goodman Law Firm, APC

11440 W Bernardo Court Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92127

Brittany Lyn Shaw

Attorney at Sessions, Fishman, Nathan & Israel LLP

1545 Hotel Circle South Suite 150

San Diego, CA 92108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appeal dismissed - case information statement not filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • HearingDescription: Order to show cause - court reporter or atty.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: needs copy of order or judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Daniel Ochoa Pro Per Appellant Daniel Ochoa w/o copy of order or judgment attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Daniel OchoaPro Per; Notes: Appellant Daniel Ochoa w/o copy of order or judgment attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Appellant, re: Today, you submitted your notice designating record on appeal. This document has only been received and not filed since it needs to be filed the San Francisco County Superior Court. If you have not already done so, please be sure to submit your designation for filing with that court. Please note this is a time sensitive document.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: not a filed stamped copy; designating CT and RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: from appellant - page 1 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: App-016/FW-016 Order on Court Fee Waiver (Court of Appeal or Supreme Court)- page 1 only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: App-016/FW-016 Order on Court Fee Waiver (Court of Appeal or Supreme Court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: 07/08/2021(attached to the notice of appeal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 06/17/2021 by Plaintiff Daniel Ochoa in propria persona appealing judgment from 10/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CGC20583076

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Assurant, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Convergent Outsourcing, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'REILLY THEODORE