This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/23/2023 at 01:06:02 (UTC).

Nye et al. v. Walt Disney Company

Case Summary

On 02/17/2023 Nye filed an Other lawsuit against Walt Disney Company. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lyons, Dalila. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6567

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lyons, Dalila

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

William S. Nye

James McKenna

Erren Gottlieb

Abblesoft, Inc.

Cascade Public Media

Defendants and Respondents

Walt Disney Company

Buena Vista Television, LLC

Touchstone Television Productions, Inc.

ABC Television, Inc.

Disney Educational Productions, Inc.

The Disney Movie Club

Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc.

ABC National Television Sales, Inc.

Walt Disney Pictures

Touchstone Television Productions, LLC

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth G. Chilton

Patricia L. Glaser

Sean Riley

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Christopher A. Elliott

Lucia Esperanza Coyoca

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/07/2023

HearingDescription: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/22/2023

DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: a respondent's brief was due on 11/20/2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/15/2023

DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief. Due on 11/20/2023 By 60 Day(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: volumes 21 through 25 (out of 25)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: volumes 11 through 20 (out of 25)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: volumes 1 through 10 (out of 25)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: William S. Nye Attorney: Miriam Biz Plaintiff and Appellant: James McKenna Attorney: Miriam Biz Plaintiff and Appellant: Erren Gottlieb Attorney: Miriam Biz Plaintiff and Appellant: Abblesoft, Inc. Attorney: Miriam Biz Plaintiff and Appellant: Cascade Public Media Attorney: Miriam Biz

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketBrief: Case on ready list; no reply by respondent to notice re failure to file brief.; Due Date: 12/07/2023; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Walt Disney CompanyAttorney: Christopher A. Elliott Attorney: Lucia Esperanza Coyoca Defendant and Respondent: Buena Vista Television, LLC Defendant and Respondent: Touchstone Television Productions, Inc. Defendant and Respondent: ABC Television, Inc. Defendant and Respondent: Disney Educational Productions, Inc. Defendant and Respondent: The Disney Movie Club Defendant and Respondent: Buena Vista Home Entertainment, Inc. Defendant and Respondent: ABC National Television Sales, Inc. Defendant and Respondent: Walt Disney Pictures Defendant and Respondent: Touchstone Television Productions, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/22/2023

DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: William S. NyeAttorney: Miriam Biz Plaintiff and Appellant: James McKennaAttorney: Miriam Biz Plaintiff and Appellant: Erren GottliebAttorney: Miriam Biz Plaintiff and Appellant: Abblesoft, Inc.Attorney: Miriam Biz Plaintiff and Appellant: Cascade Public MediaAttorney: Miriam Biz

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2023

DocketDescription: Filed change of firm name.; Notes: notice of change of firm name filed by appellants counsel: Glaser Weil Fink Howard Jordan & Shapiro LLP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/11/2023

DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: EIGHT: Reporters.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/10/2023

DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 24, 2023

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: William S. Nye Attorney: Sean Riley Plaintiff and Appellant: James McKenna Attorney: Sean Riley Plaintiff and Appellant: Erren Gottlieb Attorney: Sean Riley Plaintiff and Appellant: Abblesoft, Inc. Attorney: Sean Riley Plaintiff and Appellant: Cascade Public Media Attorney: Sean Riley

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: William S. NyeAttorney: Sean Riley Plaintiff and Appellant: James McKennaAttorney: Sean Riley Plaintiff and Appellant: Erren GottliebAttorney: Sean Riley Plaintiff and Appellant: Abblesoft, Inc.Attorney: Sean Riley Plaintiff and Appellant: Cascade Public MediaAttorney: Sean Riley

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/03/2023

DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellants associate in Attorney Elizabeth G. Chilton as co-counsel of record and associate out Attorneys Richard W. Buckner and Myriam Biz.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #404453 for $775.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2023

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on February 17, 2023 by William S. Nye, James McKenna, Erren Gottlieb, Abblesoft, Inc. and Cascade Public Media.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less