This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/25/2022 at 04:02:33 (UTC).

Nowzari v. Torrance Memorial Medical Center Health Care Foundation

Case Summary

On 10/12/2022 Nowzari filed an Other lawsuit against Torrance Memorial Medical Center Health Care Foundation. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chalfant, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4119

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Chalfant, James

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Farhad Nowzari

Respondent and Defendant

Torrance Memorial Medical Center Health Care Foundation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Joel Bruce Douglas

Attorney at Bonne, Bridges, Mueller, O'Keefe & Nichols

355 S. Grand Ave. Suite 1750

Los Angeles, CA 90010-1562

Edward Idell

Attorney at Bonne, Bridges, Mueller, O'Keefe & Nichols

355 South Grand Avenue Suite 1750

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Cassidy C. Davenport

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Drive

San Marino, CA 91108

Kenneth R. Pedroza

Attorney at Cole Pedroza LLP

2295 Huntington Dr

San Marino, CA 91108

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Documents refiled.; Notes: consolidated with case B321862 - see order:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: joint motion to consolidate appeal nos. B321862 and B324119 filed by parties

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Farhad Nowzari Attorney: Edward Idell (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Farhad NowzariAttorney: Edward Idell; Notes: (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #402654 for $775 from lasc.(U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 12, 2022 by Farhad Nowzari. (U)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCP02300; Trial Court Judge: Chalfant, James

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVENPORT CASSIDY COLE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PEDROZA, KENNETH R