This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/06/2022 at 21:51:15 (UTC).

NOWICKI v. CONTRA COSTA COUNTY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 09/20/2021 NOWICKI filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CONTRA COSTA COUNTY EMPLOYEES' RETIREMENT ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0959

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Peter J. Nowicki

Defendant and Respondent

Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Kaiser

Attorney at Messing Adam & Jasmine, LLP

980 9Th Street, Suite 380

Sacramento, CA 95814-2723

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Harvey L. Leiderman

Attorney at Reed Smith

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105-3659

Maytak Chin

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

101 Second Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition and Depub. request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review & depublication request(s) denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association Attorney: Maytak Chin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition to depublication request filed; Notes: Peter J. Nowicki, Plaintiff and Appellant Steven Kaiser, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Peter J. Nowicki Attorney: Steven Kaiser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for depublication (petition for review pending); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association Attorney: Maytak Chin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Contra Costa County Employees' Retirement Association Attorney: Maytak Chin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: A160337; Disposition: Reversed in full; Trial Court: Contra Costa County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: MSC1701266

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONTRA COSTA COMMUNITY EMPLOYEES RETIREMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harvey Lewis Leiderman