This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/16/2023 at 10:09:12 (UTC).

NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER v. S.C. (ARTEAGA)

Case Summary

On 06/13/2022 NORWALK MEADOWS NURSING CENTER filed an Other lawsuit against C ARTEAGA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5019

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center

Premier B.H., Inc.

Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Frederick Bennett 111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Valente Cruz Arteaga

Juana Cruz

Rebecca Sanchez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Bryan R. Reid

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

650 East Hospitality Lane, Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Dean H. McVay

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

650 East Hospitality Lane, Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Wendy S. Dowse

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street, Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Dean Harold McVay

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

650 East Hospitality Lane, Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Respondent Attorney

Hon. Bruce Iwasaki

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Department 058

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Lisa Trinh Flint

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

David E. Ramirez

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Michael Francis Moran

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive, Suite 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition withdrawn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition ordered withdrawn; Notes: Petitioner's request, filed on August 9, 2022, to withdraw the petition for review is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request to withdraw petition filed; Notes: Petitioners' Motion to Withdraw Petition for Review By Jeffry A. Miller, counsel for petitioners.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including September 9, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center Attorney: Jeffry A. Miller Attorney: Wendy S. Dowse Petitioner: Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center, LP Attorney: Jeffry A. Miller Attorney: Wendy S. Dowse Petitioner: Premier B.H., Inc. Attorney: Jeffry A. Miller Attorney: Wendy S. Dowse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B320558; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV20738

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less