This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/15/2023 at 11:12:47 (UTC).

Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Iwasaki, Bruce. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0558

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Iwasaki, Bruce

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Norwalk Meadows Nursing Center

LP

Premier B.H., Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Bruce Iwasaki

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Valente Cruz Arteaga

Juana Cruz

Rebecca Sanchez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Bryan R. Reid

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

650 East Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Dean Harold McVay

Attorney at Lewis, Brisbois Bisgaard Smith LLP

650 East Hospitality Lane Suite 600

San Bernardino, CA 92408

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Wendy Sabina Dowse

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street Ste 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Michael Francis Moran

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive Suite 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Lisa Trinh Flint

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive Suite 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

David E. Ramirez

Attorney at Moran Law

5 Hutton Centre Drive Ste 1050

Santa Ana, CA 92707

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: Petitioner's request, filed on August 9, 2022, to withdraw the petition for review is granted. [S275019]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed re:; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including September 9, 2022, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied. [S275019]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record transmitted to Supreme Court electronically.; Notes: E-sent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Petitioner's petition for review.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed May 24, 2022. The petition is denied. Petitioners fail to demonstrate the respondent court erred in issuing its May 4, 2022, order.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Eight volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less