This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/05/2022 at 01:05:00 (UTC).

North Valley Military Institute College Preparatory Academy v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 North Valley Military Institute College Preparatory Academy filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Strobel, Mary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1269

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Strobel, Mary

 

Party Details

Petitioner

North Valley Military Institute College Preparatory Academy

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Mary Strobel

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Los Angeles Unified School District

Board of Education of the Los Angeles Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Paul Christian Minney

Attorney at Young, Minney & Corr, LLP

655 University Avenue Suite 150

Sacramento, CA 95825

Sarah Jean Kollman

Attorney at Young Minney & Corr

655 University Ave Ste 150

Sacramento, CA 95825-6734

Kevin M. Troy

Attorney at Young Minney & Corr LLP

655 University Ave Suite 150

Sacramento, CA 95825

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

David Michael Huff

Attorney at Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 575

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Marley Suzanne Fox

Attorney at Orbach Huff & Henderson LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 575

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6007

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed June 29, 2022 and the preliminary opposition filed July 11, 2022. The petition is denied. Petitioner fails to demonstrate the respondent court lacked authority to remand the matter to the school district with directions to make findings and adopt a statement of reasons. Nothing in this order precludes petitioner from challenging the new findings and statement of reasons, not does it prevent the trial court from fashioning additional relief of warranted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: Real Parties in interest's preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandamus; One volume of exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service to Petition and seven volumes of exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Seven volumes of exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH VALLEY MILITARY INSTITUTE is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where LOS ANGELES UNIFIED SCHOOL DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HUFF DAVID MICHAEL