This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/04/2021 at 14:39:35 (UTC).

Nole v. Superior Court for the County of Del Norte

Case Summary

On 08/31/2020 Nole filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Del Norte. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cochran, Robert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0829

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cochran, Robert

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jody Allen Nole

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Del Norte

Interested Parties

Kaitlin Janice Nole

The People

Edward Bert Steele

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

James Mitchell Fallman, Jr.

250 Leavitt Mall

Crescent City, CA 95531

Interested Party Attorneys

Keith Vernon Morris

Attorney at Keith Morris, Attorney at Law

341 H St

Crescent City, CA 95531-4017

Office of District Attorney

450 "H" Street #171

Crescent City, CA 95531

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Karen D. Olson

431 H Street, Suite A

Crescent City, CA 95531

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • DocketDescription: Shipped to state retention center, box # / list #:; Notes: entire file electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT:* The petition for a writ of mandate and the related request for a stay are denied. (sig,fuj,pet)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT:* The petition for a writ of mandate and the related request for a stay are denied. (sig,fuj,pet)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Transcript Vol II; Pages 173 - 181

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Transcript pages 150 to 172Exhibit 4 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Transcript pages 100 to 159Exhibit 3 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Transcript pages 50 - 99Exhibit 2 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Transcript pages 1 - 49Exhibit 1 of 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Information filed for Arraignment 6/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: People's Opposition to Motion to Sever

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Motion to Sever filed July 7, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Notice of Motion to Sever filed February 3, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Minute Order dated 3/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Minute Order dated 7/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate Request for Stay of Trial Set for September 21, 2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Del Norte County Superior Court; County: Del Norte; Trial Court Case Number: CRF209041; Trial Court Judge: Cochran, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Solano is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant