This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/15/2022 at 03:30:18 (UTC).

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA v. S.C. (ABADIA)

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 NISSAN NORTH AMERICA filed an Other lawsuit against C ABADIA. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9704

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nissan North America Inc.

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Parties

Gumercindo Abadia

Marco Abadia

Rubi Carolina Ramirez Aguero

Isabel Aguilar

David Ahumada

Maria Ascencio

Yesica L. Alatorre

Alba Macias

Juan Ramon

Araceli Barcenas De Alba

Thomas Montelongo Alba

Daniel Alcala

Angel Garibay

Noel Sergio Zavala

Leticia Zamora-Martinez

Miguel De La Cruz Zamora

Gloria Zamora

Yesenia Perez Zafra

665 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Alan J. Lazarus

Attorney at Faegre, Drinker, Biddle & Reath LLP

Four Embarcadero Center 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4180

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Jessica Farrah Anvar

Attorney at Consumer Law Experts, PC

5757 West Century Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045-6417

Benjeman R Beck

Attorney at Consumer Law Experts, PC

5757 West Century Boulevard, Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90045

Steve Borislav Mikhov

Attorney at Knight Law Group, LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Amy-Lyn Morse

Attorney at Knight Law Group, LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90067-6225

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Petitioner: Nissan North America Inc. Attorney: Alan J. Lazarus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file over-length brief filed; Notes: -------------------------------------------------------------------------------- Nissan North America Inc., Petitioner Alan J. Lazarus, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: Nissan North America Inc. Attorney: Alan J. Lazarus

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311393; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: JCCP5059

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where Nissan North America Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MORSE AMY-LYN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIKHOV STEVE B