Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 07/13/2021 at 13:08:26 (UTC).

Nissan North America, Inc. et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Nissan North America, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Duffy-Lewis, Maureen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9331

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 5

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Duffy-Lewis, Maureen

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Nissan North America, Inc.

HNL Automotive, Inc.

Nissan Motor Co., Ltd

Nissan Design America, Inc.

Autoliv ASP, Inc.

Nissan Technical Center North America, Inc.

Fernando Galvis Ortiz

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Maureen Duffy-Lewis

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Shanel Salinas

Nicole Salinas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jordan S. Tabak

Attorney at Bowman and Brooke, LLP

970 West 190Th Street Suite 700

Torrance, CA 90502

Christophe B. Cato

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

101 West Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Kimberly Ann Blake

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP

101 W Broadway Ste 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Edye Ann Hill

Attorney at Ford, Walker, Haggerty & Behar LLP

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831

Robert Lee Reisinger

Attorney at Ford Walker Haggerty & Behar LLP

One World Trade Center 27Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90831-2700

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Reza Torkzadeh

Attorney at The Torkzadeh Law Firm

11601 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 500

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Arash Homampour

Attorney at The Homampour Law Firm, PC

15303 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1450

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed December 11, 2020 and the preliminary opposition filed December 22, 2020. The petition is denied. Petitioners have an adequate remedy by way of appeal. (Pac. Tel. & Tel. Co. v. Superior Court (1970) 2 Cal.3d 161, 169-70.)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee by Real Party In InterestResponsive filing fee paid by The Homampour Law Firm, PC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Real Party in Interest, Salinas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDescription: Opposition - opposition to petition; Notes: Real Party in Interest's preliminary opposition to petition for writ of mandate (Late filed with permission from the court)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service of petition for writ of mandate from order striking petitioners' expert; request for immediate stay of August 24, 2020 order striking Dr. Kyle Boone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Proof of service on superior court of petition for writ of mandate from order striking petitioners' expert; request for immediate stay of August 24, 2020 order striking Dr. Kyle Boone

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Non-compliance issued for missing proofs of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The immediate stay request is denied. Petitioners fail to make an adequate showing of urgency.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 10 of 10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate ~ Stay.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NISSAN DESIGN AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where AUTOLIV ASP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where NISSAN TECHNICAL CTR NORTH AMERICA,INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HNL AUTOMOTIVE INC. is a litigant