This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/24/2022 at 17:02:11 (UTC).

Nilsen v. The Superior Court of San Mateo County

Case Summary

On 09/16/2022 Nilsen filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of San Mateo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Finigan, Jeffrey and Hill, Elizabeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6118

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judges

Finigan, Jeffrey

Hill, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Vance Nilsen

San Diego, CA 92179

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Mateo County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of District Attorney

400 County Center

Redwood City, CA 94063

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition, which we construe as one for a writ of habeas corpus, is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition, which we construe as one for a writ of habeas corpus, is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: SC014343A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: HC3043; Trial Court Judge: Hill, Elizabeth

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: HC2901; Trial Court Judge: Finigan, Jeffrey

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of San Mateo County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant