This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/19/2021 at 04:58:08 (UTC).

NIKOLAYCHUK v. CAPITAL ONE

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 NIKOLAYCHUK filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CAPITAL ONE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6436

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Alexander Nikolaychuk

Respondents and Defendants

Integrated Lender Services, Inc.

Capital One, NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Terence J. Mix

Attorney at Law Offices Of Terence J. Mix

2052 Avenue Of The Trees

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Jan T. Chilton

Attorney at Severson & Werson

One Embarcadero Center, Suite 2600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including April 5, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Capital One, NA Attorney: Jan T. Chilton Defendant and Respondent: Integrated Lender Services, Inc. Attorney: Jan T. Chilton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Alexander Nikolaychuk Attorney: Terence J. Mix

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 4; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303760; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC698251

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTEGRATED LENDER SERVICES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CAPITAL ONE N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jan T. Chilton