This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/29/2023 at 02:02:44 (UTC).

NHC SLO, LLC v. San Luis Obispo Superior Court

Case Summary

On 04/01/2022 NHC SLO, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against San Luis Obispo Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Federman, Rita. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9412

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Federman, Rita

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NHC SLO, LLC

Respondent

San Luis Obispo Superior Court

Interested Parties

City of San Luis Obispo

City Counsel of and for the City of San Luis Obispo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

John Robert Armstrong, II

Attorney at Armstrong Law Group

23232 Peralta Dr Ste 102

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

Interested Party Attorneys

Jeffrey V. Dunn

Attorney at Best, Best & Krieger LLP

18101 Von Karman Avenue Suite 1000

Irvine, CA 92612

Daniel Lee Richards

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger

18101 Von Karman Ave Ste 1000

Irvine, CA 92612-164

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied in Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Service copy of petition for review received.; Notes: Attorney J. Armstrong for petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final GYP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: GYPThe petition for a writ of mandate or, alternatively, prohibition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Supplemental proof of service on San Luis Obispo County Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: A Notice of Errata or Application for Permission to File Amended Writ must be submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition/Other Relief File 2 of 2, Volumes 2 of 2, pp. 244-315

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Exhibits to Petition for Writ of Mandamus/Prohibition/Other Relief File 1 of 2, Volumes 1 of 2, pp. 1-243

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS, PROHIBITION, OR OTHER WARRANTED RELIEF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Luis Obispo County Superior Court - Main (SLO Court 1); County: San Luis Obispo; Trial Court Case Number: 21CV-0734; Trial Court Judge: Federman, Rita

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less