This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/04/2021 at 03:15:00 (UTC).

NetEase, Inc. et al. v. PUBG Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 NetEase, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against PUBG Corporation. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Miram, George. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0572

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Miram, George

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Appellants

Hong Kong NetEase Interactive Entertainment Limited

NetEase Information Technology Corporation

NetEase, Inc.

Interested Parties, Respondents and Defendants

PUBG Corporation

PUBG Santa Monica, Inc.

Superior Court for the County of San Mateo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Margaret Mary Caruso

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Dr 5Th Fl

Redwood City, CA 94065

Claude Michael Stern

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan

555 Twin Dolphin Drive - 5Th Floor

Redwood Shores, CA 94065

Michael Francis LaFond

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Dr 5Th Fl

Redwood City, CA 94065

William Pilon

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

555 Twin Dolphin Drive, 5Th Floor

Redwood City, CA 94065

Interested Party, Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Diana Hughes Leiden

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

333 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

David Enzminger

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

333 S. Grand Ave., Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1503

Deven Taylor Klee

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

333 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Megan Lee Whipp

Attorney at Winston & Strawn

333 S Grand Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's reply brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: Sealed and Confidential version of RBF and Appendix were received on 1/21/22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: PUBG Corporation Attorney: David Enzminger Public Version - Redacts Material from Sealed Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's appendix filed.; Notes: Vol. 1 of 1 Pages 1 - 73 Public Version - Redacts Material Filed Under Seal with The Trial Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Due Date: 02/10/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: NetEase, Inc.Attorney: Margaret Mary Caruso

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: PUBG CorporationAttorney: David Enzminger; Notes: Public Version - Redacts Material from Sealed Record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: PUBG Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Respondent notified re failure to file respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: PUBG Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Partial BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of supersedeas is denied. On November 5, 2020, the superior court granted appellants' motion for clarification of the preliminary injunction that is the subject of this appeal. At the same time, the lower court denied respondents' application for an order to show cause regarding contempt. Appellants stated in their petition that "[i]f the trial court clarifies . . . its order . . . and rejects PUBG's efforts to hold NetEase in contempt, then no stay will be necessary." (Petn., p. 79.) By appellants' own admission, since the superior court has now clarified its injunctive order, no stay is necessary. The petition for writ of supersedeas is therefore denied as moot. Before: Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Banke, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The petition for writ of supersedeas is denied. On November 5, 2020, the superior court granted appellants' motion for clarification of the preliminary injunction that is the subject of this appeal. At the same time, the lower court denied respondents' application for an order to show cause regarding contempt. Appellants stated in their petition that "[i]f the trial court clarifies . . . its order . . . and rejects PUBG's efforts to hold NetEase in contempt, then no stay will be necessary." (Petn., p. 79.) By appellants' own admission, since the superior court has now clarified its injunctive order, no stay is necessary. The petition for writ of supersedeas is therefore denied as moot. Before: Humes, P.J., Margulies, J., and Banke, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
94 More Docket Entries
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: of Margret Caruso in Support of Separately Filed Emergency Petition, etc. - Volume 3 ***Contains Material Conditionally Filed Under Seal***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: of Margret Caruso in Support of Separately Filed Emergency Petition, etc. - Volume 2 ***Contains Material Conditionally Filed Under Seal***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: of Margret Caruso in Support of Separately Filed Emergency Petition, etc. - Volume 1 ***Contains Material Conditionally Filed Under Seal***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: Conditionally Filed Under Seal With Trial Court Immediate Relief Requested - Motion for Temporary Stay of Preliminary Injunction Order Pending Petition for Writ of Supersedeas

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: of Margret Caruso in Support of Separately Filed Emergency Petition, etc. - Volume 4 ***Public - Redacted***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: of Margret Caruso in Support of Separately Filed Emergency Petition, etc. - Volume 3 ***Public - Redacted***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: of Margret Caruso in Support of Separately Filed Emergency Petition, etc. - Volume 2 ***Public - Redacted***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: of Margret Caruso in Support of Separately Filed Emergency Petition, etc. - Volume 1 ***Public - Redacted***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of supersedeas filed.; Notes: Immediate Relief Requested - Motion for Temporary Stay of Preliminary Injunction Order Pending Petition for Writ of Supersedeas ***Public***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 20CIV01382; Trial Court Judge: Miram, George

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of San Mateo is a litigant

Latest cases where NETEASE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PUBG CORPORATION is a litigant