This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/24/2023 at 09:01:37 (UTC).

Nelson v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 02/23/2023 Nelson filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Christian, Deborah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6632

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Christian, Deborah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael Nelson

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Deborah Christian

Interested Party

Laura Bussell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Court Counsel

Interested Party Attorney

Larry Masashi Nakahara

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on February 23, 2023. The petition is denied. Petitioner fails to provide an adequate record for review. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b); Sherwood v. Superior Court (1979) 24 Cal.3d 183, 186-187.) Further, petitioner's challenge to the surcharge proceedings can be raised on appeal. (Prob. Code, 1300, subd. (g).)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less