This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/10/2022 at 11:59:39 (UTC).

NEFF v. BOSCHEE

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 NEFF filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against BOSCHEE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9089

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Burkley Neff

Renita Kay Griffin

Defendants and Respondents

Vere Enterprises

Carol Anderson

Holly Boschee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Michael D. Kwasigroch

Attorney at Law Offices of Michael Kwasigroch

1975 Royal Avenue, Suite 4

Simi Valley, CA 93065

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Mark C. Carlson

Attorney at Carlson Law Group

6300 Canoga Avenue, Suite 1300

Woodland Hills, CA 91364

Anne Marie Watson

Attorney at Carlson Law Group, Inc.

3180 Crow Canyon Place, Suite 109

San Ramon, CA 94583

Larry De Sha

Attorney at Attorney at Law

5077 Via Cupertino

Camarillo, CA 93012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Carol Anderson Attorney: Mark C. Carlson Defendant and Respondent: Vere Enterprises Attorney: Mark C. Carlson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Burkley Neff Attorney: Michael D. Kwasigroch Plaintiff and Appellant: Renita Kay Griffin Attorney: Michael D. Kwasigroch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 6; Court of Appeal Case Number: B302775; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); Trial Court Case Number: 56-2015-00471260-CU-WE-VTA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERE ENTERPRISES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION DBA RE/MAX OF VALENCIA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne M Watson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARLSON MARK C. ESQ.