This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/13/2022 at 14:02:48 (UTC).

NEELY v. S.C. (PEOPLE)

Case Summary

On 05/31/2022 NEELY filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against C PEOPLE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4668

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

William S. Neely

Ione, CA 95640

Respondent

Superior Court of Sacramento County

720 Ninth Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Anne Marie Schubert

Attorney at Office of the District Attorney

901 G Street

Sacramento, CA 95814

Attorney General - Sacramento Office

P.O. Box 944255

Sacramento, CA 94244-2550

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record; Notes: petition for review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: The petition for review is denied without prejudice to petitioner filing a Penal Code section 1054.9 motion for post-conviction discovery in the Sacramento County Superior Court. Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., was recused and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Mr. Neely: The court has granted permission to file the untimely petition for review and the petition was filed on this date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Petitioner: William S. Neely Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for relief from default filed; Notes: William S. Neely, Petitioner Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: petitioner, to file application for relief from default.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received untimely petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: William S. Neely Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C096083; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 03F05570

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Sacramento County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anne Marie Schubert